NY A03641 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the office of financial freedom to assist in the monetization, purchasing, and cancellation of personal debt, including student loan debt; medical debt, home loan debt, auto loan debt, credit card debt, small business loan debt and other consumer debt; permits debt to be purchased and written-down through eminent domain.
Title
Creates the office of financial freedom to assist in the monetization, purchasing, and cancellation of personal debt, including student loan debt; medical debt, home loan debt, auto loan debt, credit card debt, small business loan debt and other consumer debt; permits debt to be purchased and written-down through eminent domain.
Sponsors
Asm. Ron Kim [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | print number 3641b |
2019-10-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | print number 3641a |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |