NY A03582 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.506
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.506
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently extends the revival of time barred causes of action for an injury or death caused by contact with or exposure to phenoxy herbicides for those persons serving as members of the armed forces in Indo-China from November 1, 1955 through May 7, 1975.
Title
Permanently extends the revival of time barred causes of action for an injury or death caused by contact with or exposure to phenoxy herbicides for those persons serving as members of the armed forces in Indo-China from November 1, 1955 through May 7, 1975.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Assembly | signed chap.506 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1396 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9076 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.180 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.180 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | print number 3582a |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S09076 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3582A