NY A03575 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the director of the classification and compensation division to classify any position requiring foreign language skills as being entitled to be paid a salary differential; requires the establishment of supervisory positions for employees required to have foreign language skills; requires establishment of career ladders for such employees; directs the department of civil service to report to the governor and the legislature on employees in state service who are required to have foreign language skills.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the director of the classification and compensation division to classify any position requiring foreign language skills as being entitled to be paid a salary differential; requires the establishment of supervisory positions for employees required to have foreign language skills; requires establishment of career ladders for such employees; directs the department of civil service to report to the governor and the legislature on employees in state service who are required to have foreign language skills.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-04Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2012-05-15Assemblyheld for consideration in governmental employees
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2011-01-25Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback