NY A03571 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Includes within the class D felony of assault in the second degree, the intentional causing of physical injury to a station cleaner or terminal cleaner employed by a mass transit company, while such cleaner is engaged in such employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes within the class D felony of assault in the second degree, the intentional causing of physical injury to a station cleaner or terminal cleaner employed by a mass transit company, while such cleaner is engaged in such employment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-04Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2012-06-05Assemblyheld for consideration in codes
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to codes
2011-01-25Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S01154 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CODES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback