NY A03563 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - signed chap.374
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on October 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-26 - signed chap.374
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain persons who administer and score objective psychological tests from provisions of law relating to the practice of the profession of psychology.
Title
Exempts certain persons who administer and score objective psychological tests from provisions of law relating to the practice of the profession of psychology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | signed chap.374 |
2015-10-14 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1865B |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.334 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.334 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | print number 3563c |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | print number 3563b |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | print number 3563a |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01865 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3563C