NY A03559 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - print number 3559b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-20 - print number 3559b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the state fire prevention and building code council to update the state fire prevention and building code and the state energy conservation construction code within 18 months of the publication of any updated or revised edition of the international and national codes relating thereto, so as to ensure that the state's codes reflect such revisions and updates.
Title
Directs the state fire prevention and building code council to update the state fire prevention and building code and the state energy conservation construction code within 18 months of the publication of any updated or revised edition of the international and national codes relating thereto, so as to ensure that the state's codes reflect such revisions and updates.
Sponsors
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Assembly | print number 3559b |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | print number 3559a |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06210 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to governmental operations