NY A03556 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that it shall be a defense to a charge of a traffic infraction for running a red light that the police manipulated such device with the purpose of assessing a ticket against an individual.
Title
Provides that it shall be a defense to a charge of a traffic infraction for running a red light that the police manipulated such device with the purpose of assessing a ticket against an individual.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Tremaine Wright [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.147 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.495 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |