NY A03547 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - print number 3547a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - print number 3547a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to BOCES intermediate districts.
Title
Extends effectiveness of provisions relating to BOCES intermediate districts.
Sponsors
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Barbara Lifton [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | Assembly | print number 3547a |
2016-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S00033 (Same As) 2016-06-07 - referred to education