NY A03545 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.151
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.151
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of arrest warrants and appearance tickets upon a youth; provides for the police officer to immediately notify the parent or other person legally responsible for the care of such youth with whom the youth is domiciled that the youth has been arrested; provides further that the police officer need not notify the parent or other person legally responsible when such youth is not also a juvenile offender and the notification would endanger the health and safety of such youth.
Title
Relates to the issuance of arrest warrants and appearance tickets upon a youth; provides for the police officer to immediately notify the parent or other person legally responsible for the care of such youth with whom the youth is domiciled that the youth has been arrested; provides further that the police officer need not notify the parent or other person legally responsible when such youth is not also a juvenile offender and the notification would endanger the health and safety of such youth.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] |
Asm. William Magee [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.151 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.151 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | print number 3545a |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S09003 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES