NY A03535 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s1974a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the commission on retired racehorses, which shall be responsible for the oversight of retired racehorses including the creation of a registry to track such racehorses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the commission on retired racehorses, which shall be responsible for the oversight of retired racehorses including the creation of a registry to track such racehorses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s1974a
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.337
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.337
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-04-24Assemblyprint number 3535a
2019-04-24Assemblyamend and recommit to racing and wagering
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to racing and wagering

Same As/Similar To

S01974 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - ordered to third reading rules cal.337

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03535&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03535&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03535
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03535&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03535A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03535&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03535&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03535&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03535&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4

Bill Comments

feedback