NY A03534 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - advanced to third reading cal.288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates, in addition to the existing sanction of criminal contempt of court, the remedies of labor law civil penalties and employee's right to bring civil action for unlawful discharge, penalty or discrimination on account of the exercise by an employee of a juror's right to be absent from employment by reason of jury service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates, in addition to the existing sanction of criminal contempt of court, the remedies of labor law civil penalties and employee's right to bring civil action for unlawful discharge, penalty or discrimination on account of the exercise by an employee of a juror's right to be absent from employment by reason of jury service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.288
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S03351 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback