NY A03533 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes licensed lenders to issue credit cards and act as financing agencies.
Title
Authorizes licensed lenders to issue credit cards and act as financing agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | reference changed to banks |
2011-01-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |