NY A03529 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits, unless authorized by state law, municipalities from authorizing or requiring local law enforcement to enforce any provision of federal immigration law, rule or regulation; requires establishment of a civilian review board in each municipality authorized to enforce federal immigration law to review actions and report on actions relating to such enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits, unless authorized by state law, municipalities from authorizing or requiring local law enforcement to enforce any provision of federal immigration law, rule or regulation; requires establishment of a civilian review board in each municipality authorized to enforce federal immigration law to review actions and report on actions relating to such enforcement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-04Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2012-06-05Assemblyheld for consideration in local governments
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to local governments
2011-01-25Assemblyreferred to local governments

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback