NY A03518 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of state and the public service commission to study and report upon the prevalence of the disclosure by public utilities, cable television companies and cellular telephone service providers to credit reporting agencies of late payments and defaults in payment of fees and charges by consumers.
Title
Directs the department of state and the public service commission to study and report upon the prevalence of the disclosure by public utilities, cable television companies and cellular telephone service providers to credit reporting agencies of late payments and defaults in payment of fees and charges by consumers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02933 (Same As) 2022-04-04 - referred to consumer affairs and protection