NY A03511 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - signed chap.742
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - signed chap.742
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds an acute children's hospital licensed by the department primarily for the provision of pediatric and neonatal services to the term enhanced safety net hospital.
Title
Adds an acute children's hospital licensed by the department primarily for the provision of pediatric and neonatal services to the term enhanced safety net hospital.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Karen McMahon [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | signed chap.742 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1499 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3530A |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.111 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.111 |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-01 | Assembly | print number 3511a |
2022-04-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03530 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3511A