NY A03506 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - print number 3506b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "marihuana regulation and taxation act"; relates to the description of marihuana, and the growing of and use of marihuana by persons twenty-one years of age or older; makes technical changes regarding the definition of marihuana; relates to the qualification of certain offenses involving marihuana and exempts certain persons from prosecution for the use, consumption, display, production or distribution of marihuana; provides for the licensure of persons authorized to produce, process and sell marihuana; levies an excise tax on certain sales of marihuana; repeals certain provisions of the penal law relating to the criminal sale of marihuana and provisions of the general business law relating to drug paraphernalia; makes an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "marihuana regulation and taxation act"; relates to the description of marihuana, and the growing of and use of marihuana by persons twenty-one years of age or older; makes technical changes regarding the definition of marihuana; relates to the qualification of certain offenses involving marihuana and exempts certain persons from prosecution for the use, consumption, display, production or distribution of marihuana; provides for the licensure of persons authorized to produce, process and sell marihuana; levies an excise tax on certain sales of marihuana; repeals certain provisions of the penal law relating to the criminal sale of marihuana and provisions of the general business law relating to drug paraphernalia; makes an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19Assemblyprint number 3506b
2017-06-19Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2017-06-13Assemblyprint number 3506a
2017-06-13Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2017-01-27Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S03040 (Same As) 2017-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 3040B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback