NY A03496 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the inclusion of a check off box on personal income tax return forms for the purpose of making a gift to the William B. Hoyt Memorial Children and Family trust fund for child abuse prevention.
Title
Provides for the inclusion of a check off box on personal income tax return forms for the purpose of making a gift to the William B. Hoyt Memorial Children and Family trust fund for child abuse prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.39 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.39 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | print number 3496b |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | print number 3496a |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07040 (Same As) 2018-05-08 - PRINT NUMBER 7040A