NY A03493 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Protects medically important antimicrobials for human public health; establishes a livestock producer may provide a medically important antimicrobial to a food-producing animal only if a licensed veterinarian, in the exercise of professional judgment, determines that the provision of the medically important antimicrobial to the animal is necessary: to control the spread of a disease or infection, to treat a disease or infection, or in relation to surgical or other medical procedures; requires veterinarians licensed to practice in New York state to file an annual report detailing their prescribing history of medically important antimicrobials to food-producing animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protects medically important antimicrobials for human public health; establishes a livestock producer may provide a medically important antimicrobial to a food-producing animal only if a licensed veterinarian, in the exercise of professional judgment, determines that the provision of the medically important antimicrobial to the animal is necessary: to control the spread of a disease or infection, to treat a disease or infection, or in relation to surgical or other medical procedures; requires veterinarians licensed to practice in New York state to file an annual report detailing their prescribing history of medically important antimicrobials to food-producing animals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-05Assemblyreferred to higher education
2021-05-03Assemblyprint number 3493b
2021-05-03Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2021-02-03Assemblyprint number 3493a
2021-02-03Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2021-01-27Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S02871 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback