NY A03486 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-10 - substituted by s5795a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the assessor of the town of Brookhaven to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from Al-Muneer Foundation, Inc. for the property located at 72 Neighborhood Road in Mastic Beach.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the assessor of the town of Brookhaven to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from Al-Muneer Foundation, Inc. for the property located at 72 Neighborhood Road in Mastic Beach.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-10Assemblysubstituted by s5795a
2023-06-01Assemblyamended on third reading 3486a
2023-06-01Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2023-06-01SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-01Assemblyrecalled from senate
2023-06-01SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2023-06-01Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-01Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-01Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.441
2023-06-01Assemblyrules report cal.441
2023-06-01Assemblyreported
2023-05-31Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-16Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-02-03Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S05795 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.436

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A3486
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03486&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03486
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03486&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03486A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03486&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03486&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03486&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03486&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback