NY A03469 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - print number 3469a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-04 - print number 3469a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires legislators and candidates for members of the legislature to provide a link to their financial disclosure statements on their official state and campaign websites which shall direct website visitors to current and past financial disclosure forms that the legislator has submitted.
Title
Requires legislators and candidates for members of the legislature to provide a link to their financial disclosure statements on their official state and campaign websites which shall direct website visitors to current and past financial disclosure forms that the legislator has submitted.
Sponsors
Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Mary Walsh [R] | Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] |
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Christopher Tague [R] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Assembly | print number 3469a |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01500 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES