NY A03462 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - advanced to third reading cal.134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the right of a defendant who has entered a plea of not guilty to an information which charges a misdemeanor to a jury trial.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the right of a defendant who has entered a plea of not guilty to an information which charges a misdemeanor to a jury trial.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.134
2019-03-12Assemblyreported
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S00033 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback