NY A03450 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-16 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides factors to be considered when a health care practitioner's opinion differs from that of referral's treating health care practitioner as to a disability; requires such health care practitioner to provide an explicit written determination and to present evidence when such practitioner's diagnosis differs from that of the treating health care practitioner who referred the patient.
Title
Provides factors to be considered when a health care practitioner's opinion differs from that of referral's treating health care practitioner as to a disability; requires such health care practitioner to provide an explicit written determination and to present evidence when such practitioner's diagnosis differs from that of the treating health care practitioner who referred the patient.
Sponsors
Asm. Keith Wright [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.504 |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to social services |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.152 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.303 |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S01840 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES