NY A03439 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing two automatic free transfers for riders using pay-per-ride Metrocards.
Title
Relates to allowing two automatic free transfers for riders using pay-per-ride Metrocards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | tabled |
2017-12-18 | Senate | vetoed memo.249 |
2017-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1780 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2560 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.407 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S02560 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3439