NY A03427 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - held for consideration in governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows salary and civil service exam credits for police officers in certain cities and property tax credits for resident officers and student loan forgiveness program for certain police officers.
Title
Allows salary and civil service exam credits for police officers in certain cities and property tax credits for resident officers and student loan forgiveness program for certain police officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental employees |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | print number 3427a |
2016-01-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S01364 (Same As) 2016-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 1364A