NY A03402 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Enrolled on November 20 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that moneys awarded as damages or obtained by judgment or settlement as a result of a cause of action commenced against officers or employees of the office of mental health shall not be considered assets for purposes of determining whether or not there exists an inability to pay for services; provides that such moneys shall not be seized, offset or otherwise attached for the purposes of paying fees for services rendered by the department of mental hygiene.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that moneys awarded as damages or obtained by judgment or settlement as a result of a cause of action commenced against officers or employees of the office of mental health shall not be considered assets for purposes of determining whether or not there exists an inability to pay for services; provides that such moneys shall not be seized, offset or otherwise attached for the purposes of paying fees for services rendered by the department of mental hygiene.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-07-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-07-22Senate3RD READING CAL.771
2020-07-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4255
2020-01-21SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2020-01-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-01-21Assemblypassed assembly
2020-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.142
2020-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2019-06-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-13Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.114
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.114
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S04255 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3402

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A3402
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03402&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03402
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03402&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03402&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03402&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03402&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A3402#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback