NY A03397 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - print number 3397a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - print number 3397a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the retention percentage for certain motor vehicle service fees.
Title
Relates to increasing the retention percentage for certain motor vehicle service fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Assembly | print number 3397a |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01908 (Same As) 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 1908A