NY A03384 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to suicide prevention; provides that the office of mental health and the education department shall identify or develop materials for educators regarding suicide prevention measures and signs of depression among school-aged students; provides that related information shall be available on the Internet and may be included in schools.
Title
Relates to suicide prevention; provides that the office of mental health and the education department shall identify or develop materials for educators regarding suicide prevention measures and signs of depression among school-aged students; provides that related information shall be available on the Internet and may be included in schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | reference changed to education |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S00636 (Same As) 2015-03-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04261 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - referred to education
S04261 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - referred to education