NY A03368 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-5)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - amended on third reading 3368a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the use of chemical flame retardants on residential upholstered furniture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of chemical flame retardants on residential upholstered furniture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28Assemblyamended on third reading 3368a
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.266
2017-05-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.504
2017-05-23Assemblyreported
2017-05-16Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-01-27Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S00742 (Same As) 2018-02-23 - PRINT NUMBER 742A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback