NY A03360 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.530
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that certain notices mailed by the compliance unit within the board of elections shall be mailed by first class mail.
Title
Establishes that certain notices mailed by the compliance unit within the board of elections shall be mailed by first class mail.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.530 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.188 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a3360 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1722 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6450 |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.188 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06450 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.530