NY A03354 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - signed chap.77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - signed chap.77
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants time off for public employees to receive a COVID-19 vaccination.
Title
Grants time off for public employees to receive a COVID-19 vaccination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Assembly | signed chap.77 |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-03-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.304 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2588A |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | motion to amend lost |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.16 |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.16 |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | print number 3354b |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | print number 3354a |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S02588 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3354B