NY A03334 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides protections against illegal voter purging.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides protections against illegal voter purging.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to election law
2019-06-10Assemblyprint number 3334c
2019-06-10Assemblyamend and recommit to election law
2019-06-05Assemblyprint number 3334b
2019-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to election law
2019-05-14Assemblyprint number 3334a
2019-05-14Assemblyamend and recommit to election law
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S02301 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback