NY A03322 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - ordered to third reading rules cal.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - ordered to third reading rules cal.38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the development of a "what mortgage applicants need to know" pamphlet on residential mortgages and provides such pamphlet shall be posted and printed in the 6 most common non-English languages spoken by individuals with limited English proficiency in New York state.
Title
Requires the development of a "what mortgage applicants need to know" pamphlet on residential mortgages and provides such pamphlet shall be posted and printed in the 6 most common non-English languages spoken by individuals with limited English proficiency in New York state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.38 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.38 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | print number 3322b |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | print number 3322a |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to banks |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S02654 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO BANKS