NY A03320 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to stipulations in summary proceedings to recover possession of real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to stipulations in summary proceedings to recover possession of real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 104 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-01Senate3RD READING CAL.1082
2021-06-01SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4455A
2021-05-26SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2021-05-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2021-05-26Assemblypassed assembly
2021-05-20Assemblyamended on third reading 3320a
2021-05-06Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.302
2021-05-04Assemblyreported
2021-01-22Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S04455 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3320A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback