NY A03298 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.505
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.505
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that certain information be provided to patients and health care practitioners regarding sudden unexpected death in epilepsy.
Title
Requires that certain information be provided to patients and health care practitioners regarding sudden unexpected death in epilepsy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Assembly | signed chap.505 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1832 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S67A |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO HEALTH |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3298a |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2022-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.121 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.110 |
2021-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00067 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3298A