NY A03276 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the application of fail-first or step therapy protocols to coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of mental health conditions.
Title
Prohibits the application of fail-first or step therapy protocols to coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of mental health conditions.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] |
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-23 | Assembly | vetoed memo.140 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.764 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5909 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.293 |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S05909 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3276