NY A03276 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes state and New York city maternal mortality review boards and the maternal mortality and morbidity advisory council for the purpose of reviewing maternal deaths and maternal morbidity and developing and disseminating findings, recommendations, and best practices to contribute to the prevention of maternal mortality and morbidity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes state and New York city maternal mortality review boards and the maternal mortality and morbidity advisory council for the purpose of reviewing maternal deaths and maternal morbidity and developing and disseminating findings, recommendations, and best practices to contribute to the prevention of maternal mortality and morbidity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-20Senate3RD READING CAL.224
2019-03-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1819
2019-03-20SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-03-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.64
2019-02-11Assemblyreported
2019-02-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-11Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01819 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3276

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03276&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03276&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03276
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03276&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03276&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03276&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A3276#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03276&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback