NY A03271 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to imposing an additional one percent occupancy tax in the city of Niagara Falls to benefit the Discover Niagara Shuttle.
Title
Relates to imposing an additional one percent occupancy tax in the city of Niagara Falls to benefit the Discover Niagara Shuttle.
Sponsors
Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. Michael Norris [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Brian Miller [R] |
Asm. Peter Lawrence [R] | Asm. John Salka [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.692 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1759 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2826 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.444 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.444 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02826 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.692