NY A03262 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-8)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows credit unions, savings banks, savings and loan associations and federal savings associations to accept and secure deposits from municipal corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows credit unions, savings banks, savings and loan associations and federal savings associations to accept and secure deposits from municipal corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-06-13Assemblyprint number 3262a
2019-06-13Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to banks
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S00322 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06079 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 6079A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback