NY A03261 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for procedure in filling vacancies in the offices of comptroller and attorney-general.
Title
Provides for procedure in filling vacancies in the offices of comptroller and attorney-general.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in judiciary |
2016-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2015-02-20 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2015-01-28 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |