NY A03227 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s668
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to conciliation and non-compliance with public assistance employment.
Title
Relates to conciliation and non-compliance with public assistance employment.
Sponsors
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Sarah Clark [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] |
Asm. Demond Meeks [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s668 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.169 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.169 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S00668 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - VETOED MEMO.59