NY A03225 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-18 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-18 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes instances of sexual conduct against a child less than seventeen years of age to certain sex offenses; removes the time limit to bring subsequent sexual offenses.
Title
Includes instances of sexual conduct against a child less than seventeen years of age to certain sex offenses; removes the time limit to bring subsequent sexual offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-18 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | print number 3225a |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S00406 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES