NY A03218 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - advanced to third reading cal.436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - advanced to third reading cal.436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement that party emblems be included in ballot design.
Title
Removes the requirement that party emblems be included in ballot design.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.436 |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.247 |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03953 (Same As) 2016-03-22 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07076 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
S07076 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES