NY A03206 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Pending: Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Conforms the definition of an inmate with a serious mental illness to the definition of "person with a serious mental illness" in the mental hygiene law.
Title
Conforms the definition of an inmate with a serious mental illness to the definition of "person with a serious mental illness" in the mental hygiene law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.256 |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.333 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S08750 (Same As) 2018-05-10 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION