NY A03203 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the authority of the commissioner of general services to lease public buildings; authorizes the commissioner of general services to promulgate any necessary rules and regulations.
Title
Relates to the authority of the commissioner of general services to lease public buildings; authorizes the commissioner of general services to promulgate any necessary rules and regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.118 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.127 |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | reported |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | print number 3203a |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01501 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES