NY A03194 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing free use of state parks for certified first responders who participated in the rescue effort at the World Trade Center on September 11, 2001.
Title
Relates to providing free use of state parks for certified first responders who participated in the rescue effort at the World Trade Center on September 11, 2001.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S03890 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE