NY A03184 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4884
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the state office of the utility consumer advocate to represent interests of residential utility customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the state office of the utility consumer advocate to represent interests of residential utility customers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08Assemblysubstituted by s4884
2021-06-08Assemblyrules report cal.542
2021-06-08Assemblyreported
2021-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-05-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2021-04-26Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-01-22Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S04884 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.55

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A3184
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03184&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03184
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03184&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03184&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03184&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03184&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4

Bill Comments

feedback