NY A03179 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - ordered to third reading rules cal.444
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - ordered to third reading rules cal.444
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric vehicle charging stations and electric vehicle capable parking spaces at certain residential and commercial buildings.
Title
Requires electric vehicle charging stations and electric vehicle capable parking spaces at certain residential and commercial buildings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.444 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.444 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | print number 3179d |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | print number 3179c |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | print number 3179b |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-09-27 | Assembly | print number 3179a |
2021-09-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07406 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - referred to codes