NY A03173 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-11 - advanced to third reading cal.109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires persons selling or offering to sell weight loss services or weight loss products to provide consumers with a weight loss and dieting information notice; sets forth such notice shall include the dangers of rapid weight loss, dieting information, and risks associated with certain medications used with weight loss programs; delineates deceptive practices; provides for penalties, including fines and injunctions; further provides for attorney general enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires persons selling or offering to sell weight loss services or weight loss products to provide consumers with a weight loss and dieting information notice; sets forth such notice shall include the dangers of rapid weight loss, dieting information, and risks associated with certain medications used with weight loss programs; delineates deceptive practices; provides for penalties, including fines and injunctions; further provides for attorney general enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.109
2021-02-09Assemblyreported
2021-02-02Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-01-22Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S03764 (Same As) 2021-01-30 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback