NY A03160 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to tier IV retirement benefits for Luke Parga; accords him tier IV benefits due to his past employment in 2006.
Title
Relates to tier IV retirement benefits for Luke Parga; accords him tier IV benefits due to his past employment in 2006.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.233 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1868 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7363 |
2016-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3160a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.143 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.82 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.82 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S02062 (Same As) 2015-01-21 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
S07363 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3160A
S07363 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3160A