NY A03152 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - signed chap.211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the additional one percent sales and use tax for Chenango county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the additional one percent sales and use tax for Chenango county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-28Assemblysigned chap.211
2023-07-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-05-24SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-05-24SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-24SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2023-05-24Senate3RD READING CAL.924
2023-05-24SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5778
2023-05-15SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2023-05-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-05-15Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-15Assemblyhome rule request
2023-05-11Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.203
2023-05-10Assemblyreported
2023-02-02Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05778 (Same As) 2023-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3152

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback